House
|
05/31/2018
|
Effective date: 03/01/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 636.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 54, nays 42, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 42. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Motion to reconsider called from the table.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 43. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 53. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Reported favorably (7-2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|