House
|
05/31/2018
|
Effective date: 8/1/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 596.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.scr12
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Reported with amendments (9-1-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|