House | 05/01/2018 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 04/30/2018 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 24. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 04/25/2018 | Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 04/30/18. | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/23/2018 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/21/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |