LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2018 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB390
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB390
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2018 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB390
Action History
House
03/28/2018
Becomes HB 747.
House
03/27/2018
Reported by substitute (6-0).
House
03/12/2018
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
House
03/02/2018
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
House
03/01/2018
Prefiled.