House | 04/05/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 16, nays 75. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Prefiled. |