Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|