Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 5 yeas and 21 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
The House recommitted the report to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2018
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, Mills, and Carter.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Huval, Bishop, and Hensgens.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/07/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|