House | 04/25/2018 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18. | ||
House | 04/17/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Reported with amendments (7-5). | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |