Senate | 04/03/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/21/2018 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Prefiled. |