House | 05/11/2018 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 40. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Reported with amendments (15-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled. |