Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Reported with amendments (16-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Reported favorably (8-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|