House
|
05/15/2018
|
Effective date: 05/15/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 211.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/07/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|