Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2018
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|