Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Peterson, and White.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Barras, Mack, and Abramson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|