House | 03/29/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/21/2018 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled. |