House | 05/14/2018 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18. | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Reported favorably (16-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled. |