House
|
05/30/2018
|
Effective date: 05/30/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 687.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice of change in House conferees: Foil,Nancy Landry, Steve Carter.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Claitor, and Luneau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered re-reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|