House | 05/07/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. | ||
House | 05/02/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled. |