House | 04/06/2018 | Recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/06/2018 | Read by title, reconsidered. | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 35. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Reported favorably (9-3). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled. |