House
|
05/22/2018
|
Effective date: 07/1/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 49.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 04/19/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2018
|
Reported favorably (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|