Senate | 04/25/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/18. | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Reported with amendments (6-0). | ||
House | 03/13/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |