House
|
06/01/2018
|
Effective date: 08/01/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 710.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/18/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2018
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 238 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (10-0).
|
|
|