House
|
05/30/2018
|
Effective date: 08/01/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 693.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 562 reported by the Committee on Commerce (14-0).
|
|
|