Senate | 04/19/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/17/2018 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Reported with amendments (16-0). | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |