House
|
06/02/2018
|
Effective date: 08/01/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 715.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 58, nays 32, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 52, nays 28, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|