House | 05/09/2018 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18. | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. | ||
House | 05/02/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Reported with amendments (11-5). | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |