House
|
06/05/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/18/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 14 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|