House
|
06/01/2018
|
Effective date: 08/01/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 707.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported with amendments (10-6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|