House | 05/16/2018 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 41. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/14/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18. | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18. | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. | ||
House | 05/02/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Reported favorably (9-8). | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |