House | 03/28/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 28, nays 71. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/21/2018 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. | ||
House | 02/20/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/20/2018 | Prefiled. |