Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 11 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 13 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|