House
|
05/15/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 84, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Reported with amendments (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported with amendments (16-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2018
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|