Senate | 05/09/2018 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18. | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 03/13/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |