House | 05/18/2018 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2018 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2018 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
House | 05/11/2018 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 79, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/11/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/11/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |