Senate | 05/18/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 71, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/14/2018 | Reported favorably (6-0). | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |