House
|
05/24/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 77, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2018
|
Reported with amendments (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|