House | 04/03/2018 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2018 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/20/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |