House
|
05/24/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 73, nays 16, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 22 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 55, nays 35. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 32. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|