Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 77, nays 6. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2018
|
Reported favorably (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|