House
|
05/15/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/08/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2018
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Reported with amendments (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|