House
|
05/15/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|