House
|
05/24/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/18/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2018
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|