House
|
05/24/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Reported with amendments (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|