Senate | 05/10/2018 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. | ||
House | 05/02/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/25/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |