House
|
05/24/2018
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|