House | 05/17/2018 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/14/2018 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2018 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/30/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |