Senate | 05/15/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/14/2018 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/11/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18. | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 05/02/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |