House | 03/19/2018 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Read by title, adopted. | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 03/13/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |