Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Effective date 6/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 649.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported with amendments (17-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|