Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Effective date 5/23/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 468.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 24 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Reported with amendments (9-8). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|